U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-40002-
  • Case Name: FRANK ELMER HEADLEY, JR
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice for Financial Management Course Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Presumed Abuse]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.