U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:25-bk-90044-
  • Case Name: Atlas Solutions Business Trust
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Administrative Closure (Case Dismissed)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Pending Dismissal - Chapter 7 or 13 Deficiencies]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice of Pending Dismissal - Chapters 7 or 13 Deficiencies]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Corp./Part.)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.