U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-mj-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ambrose-Chigo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 04, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.