U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. St. Goddard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.