U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-ap-02004-
  • Case Name: Sather v. United States Dept. of Education et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - ADV]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.