U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Murphy Oil et al v. Ballard Petroleum et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [Statement - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • March 28, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.