U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Creemedicine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearing - SDM]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Suppress ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.