U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00020
  • Case Name: A.H. et al v. Hedalen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.