U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00037-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Allard et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 08, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.