U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-20055-
  • Case Name: Jacqueline Gail Lowe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Overdue Installment Fee]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Overdue Installment Fee]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Declaration eSR]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.