U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10051
  • Case Name: B-WOOD BASEBALL LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Chapter 11 Subchapter V Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Subchapter V (Corp./Part.)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Chapter 11 Subchapter V Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.