U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10052
  • Case Name: JUSTIN RYAN NORWOOD
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion to Continue, Notice of Intent to Amend Plan, Request to Set New Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue Hearing, Notice of Intent to Amend Plan, Request to Set New Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.