U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00030-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.