U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Bartole v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • April 17, 2025: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.