U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Travel ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 11, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Take Deposition ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 02, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.