U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Webber et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection - MT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 28, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 25, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Request for Live Audio Access]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Request for Live Audio Access]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Intervene]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 18, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transfer - MT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Request for Live Audio Access]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Evidentiary Material - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 04, 2025: [Declaratory Judgment - SDM]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 04, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.