U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00036
  • Case Name: City and County of Butte-Silver Bow v. 3M Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2025: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.