U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cv-00180
  • Case Name: Olson v. Northwest Horizons, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Assignment to USMJ - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Interested Parties]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.