U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vega-Lili
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.