U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:25-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Riley et al v. Wells Fargo Bank Clearing House Service, LLC, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 16, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.