U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:25-bk-90012-
  • Case Name: Charie Kaye Walbeck and Kade John Walbeck
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Continue, Notice of Intent to Amend Plan, Request]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion to Continue, Notice of Intent to Amend Plan, Request to Set New Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue Hearing, Notice of Intent to Amend Plan, Request to Set New Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Hearing Terminated - Text Only]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.