U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:25-mj-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lozada-Dominguez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.