U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ogle, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 10, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.