U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00009-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Bissonette et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearing - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Suppress ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.