U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Grevas v. Dudek
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Statement - MT]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance- Commissioner]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 10, 2025: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.