U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Roe et al v. Noem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Request for Live Audio Access]
  • April 28, 2025: [Request for Live Audio Access]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 14, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 14, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 14, 2025: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.