U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:08-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Compassionate Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.