U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:25-bk-90064-
  • Case Name: Alexandra Leigh Kohlin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.