U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Lake v. CoreCivic
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 25, 2025: [Remark L.R. 5.1 Exhibits]
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • April 24, 2025: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Jury Notes]
  • April 24, 2025: [JERS Electronic List]
  • April 24, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 24, 2025: [Witness List - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Jury List]
  • April 21, 2025: [Jury Trial - Held - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [Telephonic Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.