U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres-Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 24, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.