U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Christofano et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Quash ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2025: [Warrant Issued (Sealed) - MT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.