U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 28, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.