open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:8:13-cr-00244-3
    Party Name:USA v. Munoz-Ramon et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mandate/Judgment]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Brief]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - (USSC Amendment)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - (USSC Amendment)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter regarding Certiorari]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Opinion of USCA]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order/Judgment from USCA]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
    Date Published:June 12, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:May 15, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?63364
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =