open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:8:14-cv-00031
    Party Name:ACI Worldwide Corp. v. MasterCard Technologies, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassignment Order]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returned Mail]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Order]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Quash]
    Date Published:July 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Appeal to Magistrate Judge Order]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Letter]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Order Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:September 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Text Only]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Index]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Brief]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?65218
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =