open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:12-40651-
    Party Name:Jeffrey J. Anderson and Melissa A. Anderson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Request to Discontinue Service of Notices]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case 9 11 12]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reopen Chapter 11 Case]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Filing in a Closed Case]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Discharge (Chapter 7, 11, 13)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Entry - Re: Withdrawal]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?143175
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =