open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:13-41518-
    Party Name:Ernest G. Foland and Barbara J. Foland
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:December 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Final Payment (Batch)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:November 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Trustee's Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Transfer/Assignment of Claim]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?151022
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =