open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:4:15-cr-03093-1
    Party Name:USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reassignment Order]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Exhibit List]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consular Notification]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Chambers Conference]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Unsealing]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C) - SEALED]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter regarding Certiorari]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Copies]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Copies]
    Date Published:May 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report/Order Terminating Probation]
    Date Published:July 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reassignment Order - Referral Capacity (CLOSED CASES) (TEXT ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reassignment Order - Referral Capacity (TEXT ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Letter]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Criminal Case]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Criminal Case]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment - Revocation]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order - GO 2014-09]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Service]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Order]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (MJs Only)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Interpreter Request for Pretrial Hearings (TEXT ONLY)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent/Order Regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release (PS 42)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Objection to Findings and Recommendation]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Response to Objection To Findings and Recommendation]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Objection To Findings and Recommendation]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Release]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mandate/Judgment]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Opinion of USCA]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Release]
    Date Published:March 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Email Motion]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Email]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Designated Clerk's Record]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Findings and Recommendation]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Letter]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order/Judgment from USCA]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Index]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Copy of IFP Memo]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Transcript]
    Date Published:February 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
    Date Published:February 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Right to Appeal]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Criminal Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings and Recommendation]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Unredacted]
    Date Published:December 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order - Text Only]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Motions No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Review]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Review]
    Date Published:October 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - (USSC Amendment)]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation Regarding USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent/Order regarding Conditions of Release (Prob 12B)]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Strike Order]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Strike]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report for Offender Under Supervision]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:September 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark - Public]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Unsealing Case]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extend]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forepersons Signature Page]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt (Exhibit)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Ended]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Began]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Panel Record]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Witness List]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Jury Pool Trial Report and SQs]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt (Other)]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reducing Sentence - (USSC Amendment)]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Tentative Findings of Fact]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Downward Departure/Variance]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Brief]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Audio File]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Oral Motion]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Pretrial Violation]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Regarding Electronic Notice Issue]
    Date Published:April 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Returned Mail]
    Date Published:January 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Retroactive Sentencing Worksheet - RESTRICTED]
    Date Published:December 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 17, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Copy of Order from USCA]
    Date Published:December 17, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:November 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - (USSC Amendment)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 Petition - Out]
    Date Published:August 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Pleadings - In]
    Date Published:August 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:July 08, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:June 03, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
    Date Published:May 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
    Date Published:May 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 12, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64489
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =