open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:14-80910-
    Party Name:Prince Dupree Spencer
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Close Bankruptcy Without Discharge]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Reminder - Certificate in Support of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Final Payment (Batch)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Stipulation Regarding NOD]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Payment Default (batch)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?154644
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =