open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:14-40838-
    Party Name:Michael R Radabaugh and Sharon R Wagner-Radabaugh
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:September 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:September 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Reminder - Certificate in Support of Discharge]
    Date Published:August 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Final Payment (Batch)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Trustee's Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?154655
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =