open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:13-42189-
    Party Name:Jimmie F Konruff
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Final Account (Chapter 7 Asset)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Report of Dividends Deposited]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Case Trustee (Chapter 7 Asset)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Final Report-Asset/Aplc Compensation]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?152546
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =