U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-80665
  • Case Name: Todd Eugene Cloyd and Ann Marie Cloyd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Service of TRUSTEES NOTICE TO CLAIMANT AND DEBTOR (batch)]
  • September 23, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Final Report (batch)]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account (batch)]
August, 2022
  • August 14, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Discharging Debtor Chapter 13 (Autodocket)]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate Regarding Chapter 13 Discharge]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Final Payment (Batch)]
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Withdrawal]
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Trustee's Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
  • July 05, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Relief from Stay]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Resistance]
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Service]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Hearing Set]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Relief from Stay]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Chapter 13 Standing Trustees FRBP 2012 Accounting]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Trustee's Resignation and Appointment of Successor Trustee]
December, 2020
  • December 06, 2020: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certification of ALC Fees]
  • November 24, 2020: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 24, 2020: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Transfer/Assignment of Claim]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Support Document]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certification of ALC Fees]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Borrow]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Borrow/Incur Debt]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Transfer/Assignment of Claim]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Entry - Re: Withdrawal]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Withdrawal]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Hearing Cont]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Resistance]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Hearing Set]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Relief from Stay]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certification of ALC Fees]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certification of ALC Fees]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Limited Motion to Modify Chapter 13 Plan Post Confirmation]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Exhibit]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Modify Ch13 Plan Post Confirmation (Limited)]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Stipulation Regarding NOD]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Payment Default (batch)]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Allow Claim Out of Time]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [9013-1 Notice]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Allow Claim Out of Time]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certification of ALC Fees]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Transfer/Assignment of Claim]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certification of ALC Fees]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Limited Motion to Modify Chapter 13 Plan Post Confirmation]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Stipulation Regarding NOD]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Modify Ch13 Plan Post Confirmation (Limited)]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Payment Default (batch)]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Motion/Notice to Allow Claims (batch)]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of TRUSTEES NOTICE TO CLAIMANT AND DEBTOR (batch)]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • May 30, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
  • May 26, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Pay Advice]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule J]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule I]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule H]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule G]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule E/F]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule D]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule C]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Schedule A/B]
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 16, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
  • May 13, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Creditor Request for Notices (No PDF Required)]
  • May 13, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.