Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:8:19-cr-00032-1
    Party Name:USA v. Gonzalez-Segura
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consular Notification]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Audio File]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark - Public]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Unsealing]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?82477
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =