open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:8:19-cv-00248
    Party Name:Lyles v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassignment Order]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Assignment of Judges]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?84075
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =