open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:8:19-cv-00249
    Party Name:Fletcher v. Loyal Source Government Services, L.L.C.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassignment Order]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike Order]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Letter]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Assignment of Judges]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?84076
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =