open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:8:19-cv-00304
    Party Name:United States of America v. $41,940.00 in United States Currency
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Warrant In Rem Issued]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Assignment of Judges]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?84311
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =