open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:19-81195-
    Party Name:Jennifer Leigh Moore
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Discharging Debtor (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:November 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (341 Filings)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Creditor Request for Notices (No PDF Required)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?176701
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =