open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:19-81194-
    Party Name:Dru Anthony Russell and Michelle Renee Russell
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Discharging Debtor (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Compromise Controversy]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [UST Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [File Claims]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Notice of Assets]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Myers, Richard D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?176699
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =