open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:4:19-cv-03111
    Party Name:Scalia v. Bushido, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Assignment of Judges]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?85873
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =