open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:8:19-cv-00531
    Party Name:United States of America v. $110,000.00 In United States Currency
  • Filing Type:Civil [Audio File]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Email Motion]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Email]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (TIME)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassignment Order]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:January 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Warrant In Rem Issued]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Assignment of Judges]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?85883
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =