U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-mj-03148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duarte
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Remark - Public]
  • January 24, 2020: [Brief]
  • January 24, 2020: [Dismiss Magistrate Case]
  • January 08, 2020: [Audio File]
  • January 08, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2019: [Consular Notification]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 18, 2019: [Audio File]
  • December 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 17, 2019: [Complaint]
  • December 17, 2019: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.